IL SB2021 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-RECORDS-SEALED/EXPUNGED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-29HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-29HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-26HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-24SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Hastings
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback