IL SB2012 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall, by rule, provide for a number of Wild Turkey Hunting Permits to be set aside specifically for wild turkey outfitters operating in this State with a valid outfitter permit. Authorizes wild turkey outfitters to provide these permits to customers in the course of providing outfitting services. Provides that nothing shall prohibit a wild turkey outfitter from scheduling hunts with persons holding permits not otherwise provided by the outfitter.
Title
WILDLIFE-OUTFITTER PERMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-004-001 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2012&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2012.htm |