IL SB2011 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that a registered pharmacist filling a prescription for an opioid substance listed in Schedule II may dispense the prescribed substance in a lesser quantity than the recommended full quantity indicated on the prescription if requested by the patient provided that the prescription complies with the requirements of the Act. Provides that the remaining quantity in excess of the quantity requested by the patient shall be void. Provides that if the dispensed quantity is less than the recommended full quantity, the pharmacist or his or her designee shall, within a reasonable time following a reduction in quantity but not more than 7 days, notify the prescribing practitioner of the quantity actually dispensed. Provides that nothing in this provision shall be interpreted to conflict with or supersede any other requirement established in the Act for a prescription of an opiate substance or any requirements or conditions for drug substitutions established in the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROLLED SUB-SCHED II

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570312Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback