IL SB2011 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a pension fund has a reserve of less than the accrued liabilities of the fund, the board of the pension fund, in making its annual report to the city council or board of trustees of the municipality, shall designate the amount, calculated as a level percentage of payroll, needed annually to insure the accumulation of the reserve to the level of the fund's accrued liabilities over a period of 40 years from July 1, 2009 (was, from July 1, 1993). Amends the Downstate Fire Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In provisions concerning financing of funds through taxes, provides that the annual actuarial requirements of the pension fund are equal to (1) the normal cost of the pension fund, or 17.5% of the salaries and wages to be paid to firefighters for the year involved, whichever is greater, plus (2) the annual amount necessary to amortize the fund's unfunded accrued liabilities over a period of 40 years from July 1, 2009 (was, from July 1, 1993). Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 3 & 4-FINANCING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-09-30 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-09-30 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-09-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-05-31 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-29 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-05-08 | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2009 | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 048-008-001 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 007-000-002 | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |