IL SB2009 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that by June 30, 2022, the Department of Human Services shall reduce the number of individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities on the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services (PUNS) database by no fewer than 800 persons. Provides that the number of persons listed shall be reduced each year by the following amounts: no fewer than 1,000 persons between July 1, 2022 and June 30, 2023; and no fewer than 1,200 persons beginning July 1, 2023, and every July 1 thereafter, until the list of persons on the PUNS database awaiting State services is exhausted. Requires the Department to apply for all available federal funding options to increase services and supports for individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities. Provides that for future applicants, the Department shall provide adequate funding for the required services and supports for each individual listed in the seeking services category on the PUNS database within 90 calendar days after the individual is placed on the PUNS database after completing an enrollment form with a Department pre-admission screener. Provides that for future applicants, the Department shall identify the required services and supports for each individual listed in the planning for services category on the PUNS database within 180 calendar days after that individual is placed on the PUNS database after completing an enrollment form with a Department pre-admission screener. Requires the Department to annually report to the General Assembly, beginning September 30, 2022 and every September 30 thereafter, on the progress made in implementing the provisions of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-PUNS SERVICES
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2009&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2009.htm |