IL SB1996 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Title Insurance Act. Makes changes in the definition of "insured closing letter" or "closing protection letter". Provides that a closing protection letter shall not be issued by any person or entity other than a title insurance company. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TITLE INSURANCE-CLOSING LETTER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-001
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21515516Amended CodeCitation Text
21515517Amended CodeCitation Text
2151553Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback