IL SB1987 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Lawn Care Products Application and Notice Act. Provides that lawn markers shall be white and made of rigid material. Provides that, for applications to residential properties of 2 families or less, the applicator for hire shall be required to place on marker at a prominent location along the rear perimeter, unless access to the treated area is impassable because of a fence, wall, hedge, or natural topographic feature. Provides that failure to attempt to provide a specified notification shall be considered a violation subject to an administrative hearing. Effective on January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LAWN CARE PRODUCTS APPLICATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415653Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback