IL SB1985 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that it shall be unlawful to use lead ammunition to take wildlife in State parks or natural areas. Defines "lead ammunition" as a projectile containing one or more percent lead by weight. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE CD-LEAD AMMUNITION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-003-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52051.2k-1New CodeSee Bill Text
52052.18-1Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.33Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback