IL SB1981 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, together with the State budget, the Governor shall file a written report with the Secretary of the Senate and the Clerk of the House of Representatives containing the following: the actual or projected fund balances, revenues, and expenditures for all appropriated funds for the previous fiscal year, the current fiscal year, and the upcoming fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
GOMB-FUND BALANCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; McConchie |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McConchie |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3005 | 7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |