IL SB1981 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-002-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to trap bobcat in this State at any time. Provides that no person shall knowingly sell, offer for sale, or purchase a bobcat pelt of a bobcat taken in this State. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROHIB BOBCAT TRAPPING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-002-001
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-004-000
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.30Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.30bAmended CodeCitation Text
52052.30cAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback