IL SB1980 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that in any action by a participant or beneficiary arising under the Code or Article XIII, Section 5 of the Illinois Constitution in which there is at issue the payment of benefits due to a participant or beneficiary, the court, in its discretion, may allow either party to recover reasonable attorney's fees and the costs of the action. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ATTORNEY'S FEES
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |