IL SB1980 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that upon verified application by the Sheriff in whose custody the defendant has been remanded (in addition to current application by the State, the defendant, or the court on its own motion) the court before which the proceeding is pending may increase or reduce the amount of bail or may alter the conditions of the bail bond or grant bail where it has been previously revoked or denied. Provides that if monetary bail has been set and the defendant has been unable to post the required amount to secure release from custody, the defendant shall be required to present a verified application setting forth in detail any new facts not known or obtainable at the time of the setting of bail, or the previous revocation or denial of bail proceedings. Provides that if the court grants bail where it has previously been revoked or denied, or increases or reduces the amount of bail, the court shall state on the record of the proceedings the findings of facts and conclusion of law upon which such order is based.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-BAIL-SHERIFF PETITION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-29HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-05-04SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255110-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback