IL SB1969 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes changes to a provision prohibiting persons from causing or allowing water to accumulate in used or waste tires. Provides an exception for residential households that keep no more than 4 (rather than 12) used or waste tires at the site if they are covered and kept dry. Changes the maximum amount of money that may be allocated from the Used Tire Management Fund for specified purposes from $2,000,000 per fiscal year to $4,000,000 per fiscal year. Provides that 10% of allocations from the Used Tire Management Fund shall be allocated to the University of Illinois for the Prairie Research Institute (rather than to the Department of Natural Resources for the Illinois Natural History Survey) for specified research purposes. Provides that moneys in excess of $4,000,0000 (rather than $2,000,000) per fiscal year from the Used Tire Management Fund shall be used for specified purposes. Provides that a specified amount of the moneys in excess of $4,000,000 per year from the Used Tire Management Fund shall be used to provide grants to public universities for vector-related research, disease-related research, and for related laboratory-based equipment and field-based equipment. Provides that $300,000 from the Emergency Public Health Fund shall be allocated annually to the University of Illinois (rather than the Department of Natural Resources) for specified research purposes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-USED-WASTE TIRES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-007-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 018-000-000
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-011-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-002-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415555Amended CodeCitation Text
415555.6Amended CodeCitation Text
415555.6aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback