IL SB1936 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Executive Reorganization Implementation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPEAL FUNDS-PROJECTS-BOARDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-11-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 8, 2017
2017-11-08SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-11-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-11-08House3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-11-02HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-11-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-02HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Althoff
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15151Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback