IL SB1929 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Tenants Radon Protection Act. Provides that, before a lease is signed, a landlord shall provide each tenant in a dwelling unit with any records or reports that pertain to radon concentrations within the dwelling unit and that indicate a radon hazard exists and shall furnish each prospective tenant with a prescribed radon hazard disclosure form. Provides that, if a tenant performs a radon test, the tenant shall provide the test results to the landlord within 10 days after receiving them. Provides that nothing in the Act implies an obligation for a landlord or tenant to conduct any radon testing. Provides that a lease may be terminated under specified circumstances involving radon hazards. Preempts home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Radon Awareness Act. Repeals a provision requiring landlords to give certain disclosures to tenants. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
TENANT RADON PROTECTION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-001-001 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 46 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1929&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1929.htm |