IL SB1925 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995. Defines "little cigar". Provides that little cigars shall be taxed at a rate per little cigar that is equal to the total taxes imposed per cigarette under the Cigarette Tax Act. Provides that a distributor shall disclose the quantity of little cigars sold or otherwise disposed of.
Title
TOBACCO TX-LITTLE CIGAR RATE
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 143 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1925&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1925.htm |