IL SB1921 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the board shall list on its website all board vacancies, the election calendar, the statutory requirements for each elected board position, and election rules adopted by the board.
Title
PENCD-COOK-BD ELECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0551 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2013 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Postponed Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2013 |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 9-186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |