IL SB1920 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that if demolitions are conducted at coal-fueled power plants, the owner of the coal-fueled power plant shall, at least 60 days before commencing the demolition or as otherwise required, notify the Environmental Protection Agency and the public of the demolition and provide the Agency and the public with copies of plans for the demolition. Contains requirements for the notice. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-POWER PLANT DEMOLITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0631 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-27 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 018-003-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-18 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Energy & Environment Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |