IL SB1919 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public-Private Partnerships Act. Provides that the intent of the Act, among others, is to authorize responsible public entities to develop and enter into public-private partnership agreements for qualifying projects which result in the availability of such projects to the public in a more timely and less costly fashion, thereby serving the public safety, benefit, and welfare. Creates the Infrastructure Investment Commission, including its membership and duties. Establishes the qualifications and processes related to unsolicited proposals for projects that become public-private agreements for the building, upgrading, providing of services, operating, ownership or financing of facilities. Sets forth the procedures and standards for the formation of public-private agreements between public and private entities, including the powers of the entities and the provisions of the agreements. Establishes development and operation standards for projects. Includes provisions related to the taxation and financial arrangements related to public-private partnerships. Sets forth additional provisions related to: the acquisition of property; law enforcement; and additional powers of responsible public entities with respect to qualifying projects. Makes conforming changes in the Freedom of Information Act and the Public Funds Investment Act.
Title
PUBLIC-PRIVATE PARTNERSHIP ACT
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 235 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |