IL SB1919 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board shall establish and administer a 21st Century Employment grant program (rather than a manufacturing training grant program). Provides that in awarding grants under the program, the Board must give priority to plans that demonstrate a formal articulation agreement between a public high school and a community college district. Provides that the plan must support a seamless transition into higher education and career opportunities and must outline the college credit and on-the-job training hours that will transfer from the high school to a community college. Adds to the membership of the advisory board. Makes other changes.
Title
COM COL-MANUFACTURING GRANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0437 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-02 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Gillespie |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |