IL SB1915 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Office of the Director of State Police (rather than the Division of Administration) shall: (1) exercise the rights, powers, and duties vested in the Department of State Police by the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act; (2) exercise the rights, powers, and duties vested in the Department by the Personnel Code; and (3) exercise the rights, powers, and duties vested in the Department by the Fiscal Control and Internal Auditing Act. Changes the Division of Administration to the Division of Justice Services. Provides that the Division of Justice Services (rather than the Division of Forensic Services) shall exercise the rights, powers, and duties vested by law in the Department by the Criminal Identification Act.
Title
ST POLICE-DIVISIONS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Sen. Diane Pappas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0378 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |