IL SB1908 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act, the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act, and the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires hospitals organized under the University of Illinois Hospital Act or licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act and ambulatory surgical treatment centers licensed under the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act to: adopt policies to ensure the elimination of surgical smoke plume by use of a surgical smoke plume evacuation system for each procedure that generates surgical smoke plume from the use of energy-based devices, including electrosurgery and lasers; and report to the Department of Public Health within 90 days after the amendatory Act's effective date that the policies have been adopted.
Title
SURGICAL SMOKE EVACUATION
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0533 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 109-003-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 8d | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 5 | 6.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 6.28 | New Code | See Bill Text |