IL SB1908 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safe Patient Limits Act. Provides the maximum number of patients that may be assigned to a registered nurse in specified situations. Provides that nothing shall preclude a facility from assigning fewer patients to a registered nurse than the limits provided in Act. Provides that nothing in the Act precludes the use of patient acuity systems consistent with the Nurse Staffing by Patient Acuity Act; however, the maximum patient assignments in the Act may not be exceeded, regardless of the use and application of any patient acuity system. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules governing the implementation and operation of the Act. Provides that all facilities shall adopt written policies and procedures for training and orientation of nursing staff and that no registered nurse shall be assigned to a nursing unit or clinical area unless that nurse has, among other things, demonstrated competence in providing care in that area. Provides that the written policies and procedures for the training and orientation of nursing staff shall require that all temporary personnel receive the same amount and type of training and orientation that is required for permanent staff. Provides that the Act's provisions are severable.
Title
SAFE PATIENT LIMITS
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |