IL SB1907 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. With regard to in-state tuition charges, provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, per the federal requirements for maintaining approval for veterans' education benefits, if a person who is on active military duty or is receiving veterans' education benefits, then the board of trustees of each university or community college shall deem that person an Illinois resident for tuition purposes for any academic quarter, semester, or term, as applicable. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-IN-STATE TUITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0424 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 7e-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 8d-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 660 | 5-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 665 | 10-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 670 | 15-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 680 | 25-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 685 | 30-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 690 | 35-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 6-4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |