IL SB1898 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that whenever any application for an identification card is accompanied by a fee, and the application is refused or rejected prior to a review of the applicant's eligibility for the card, the fee shall be returned to the applicant. Provides for the expedited issuance of Illinois Identification Cards, and the fees to be charged by the Secretary of State for expedited issuance. Provides that the Secretary of State shall restrict the issuance of multiple Illinois Identification Cards and Illinois Person with a Disability Identification Cards to 3 per year and 10 total for the life of an individual, with discretion to grant exceptions to those limits. Provides for the expiration and renewal of Illinois Identification Cards and Illinois Person with a Disability Identification Cards. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the expiration of driver's licenses to non-U.S. citizens. Provides for the expedited issuance of driver's licenses, and the fees to be charged by the Secretary for expedited issuance. Provides that whenever any application for a driver's license or permit is accompanied by a fee, and the application is refused or rejected prior to a review of the applicant's eligibility for the license or permit, the fee shall be returned to the applicant. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
SOS-EXPEDITED ID CARD AND LIC
Sponsors
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. James Clayborne [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Edward Acevedo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0305 |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harris |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-122 | New Code | See Bill Text |