IL SB1897 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Tuition Reduction Act. Beginning with the 2017-2018 academic year, requires each public university located in this State to reimburse its full-time resident undergraduate students a portion of the tuition charged in the form of a grant applied directly to a student's financial aid account. Provides that to determine the per-pupil grant amount, the university shall calculate the difference, if any, between the current fiscal year's aggregate appropriations to the university and fiscal year 2015's aggregate appropriations to the university and divide that amount by the number of students enrolled in the previous academic year. Provides that 50% of this calculation then equals the per-pupil grant amount, to be awarded to currently enrolled students to reduce their tuition costs (unless the current fiscal year's aggregate appropriations to the university are equal to or less than fiscal year 2015's aggregate appropriations). Requires each university to annually report updated estimates of the total amount in grants awarded in an academic year to the Governor and the appropriate committees of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-TUITION REDUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateTo Subcommittee on Public Higher Education Administrative Costs, Tuition and Fees
2017-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback