IL SB1895 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0324
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that any individual who serves as either emergency medical services personnel on a volunteer basis or as a firefighter on a volunteer basis may not be disciplined or terminated by his or her employer for responding to an emergency call or emergency text message during work hours that requests the individual's volunteer emergency medical services or volunteer firefighter services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VOLUNTEER EMERGENCY WORKER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-24SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0324
2017-08-24SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-24SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-001
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCann
2017-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 011-000-000
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 014-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210503.56New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback