IL SB1893 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Procurement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Procurement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Records Act. Provides that a municipality must compile and maintain a list of each contract it enters into for $5,000,000 or more for public infrastructure projects. Provides that the list shall be available for public inspection or copying and on the municipality's website. Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers.
Title
LOCAL-EXPENSE DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Procurement |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Procurement |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1893&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1893.htm |