IL SB1893 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a county board may adopt reasonable regulations for the control and eradication of diseased, damaged, dead, or insect-infested trees, including trees: with Dutch elm disease or elm blight; infested by the Emerald Ash Borer, Asian Longhorn Beetle, Gypsy Moth, or other parasitic organisms; or that have been severely damaged or at a risk of falling (currently, the county board may regulate for the control and eradication of Dutch elm disease or elm blight). Provides that a county board may adopt an ordinance declaring it to be a nuisance to keep or maintain any diseased, damaged, dead, or insect-infested tree which presents a risk of falling onto any public way or public property, including utility easements and watercourses. Provides that the ordinance may authorize the county to remove nuisance trees when the property owner fails to do so in a timely manner after receiving notice thereof and to have a lien placed on the subject property for the costs of the tree removal.
Title
COUNTIES CODE-NUISANCE TREES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1077 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1893&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1893.htm |