IL SB1871 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the term "use as rolling stock moving in interstate commerce" means that a person claiming the exemption must: (1) use the vehicles or trailers to transport persons or property for hire; (2) hold, at the time of purchase, an appropriate credential that authorizes a motor carrier to engage in interstate commerce for-hire; and (3) if the person claiming the exemption is a subsidiary of another company, maintain separate books and records, including separate charts of accounts, and assure that all transactions between the transportation company and the parent are commercially reasonable arms-length transactions. Retains the current definition for aircraft and watercraft. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC TX-ROLLING STOCK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-05-25HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-25HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-24HouseArrived in House
2017-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; McGuire
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; McGuire
2017-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 005-000-000
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-61Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-51Amended CodeCitation Text
351152dAmended CodeCitation Text
351202-51Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback