IL SB1864 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that, after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a Service Board may not enter into a contract or contract amendment to purchase a bus that is not a zero-emission bus for the purpose of the Service Board's transit bus fleet. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
RTA-ZERO-EMISSION BUS CONTRACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 2.10a | New Code | See Bill Text |