IL SB1858 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Fund the Police Act. Contains findings. Creates the Fund the Police Grant Fund and provides that moneys that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board receives from the Fund must be used for the purpose of making grants to units of local government for the purposes of: (1) hiring, rehiring, and retention of law enforcement officers, including hiring and retention incentives and overtime; (2) funding body camera mandates and purchasing law enforcement equipment designed to keep officers and their communities safe; (3) funding additional law enforcement training; (4) assisting with outreach and community policing activities; (5) assisting with mental health treatment for individuals in county jails; (6) providing mental health care for law enforcement officers; and (7) purchasing public safety equipment designed to prevent gang violence, motor vehicle theft, vehicular hijacking, or the sale of contraband. Provides that the Board may set rules relating to requirements for the distribution of grant moneys and determine which law enforcement agencies are eligible. Provides that the Board must consider compliance with the Uniform Crime Reporting Act as a factor in awarding grant moneys. Provides that moneys in the Fund the Police Grant Fund may not be appropriated, assigned, or transferred to another State fund. Provides for a continuing appropriation at the beginning of each fiscal year of $125,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Fund the Police Grant Fund. Amends the State Finance Act by making conforming changes.
Title
FUND THE POLICE ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1858&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1858.htm |