IL SB1855 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides for medical assistance eligibility for persons who are: (i) age 50 through 64, or age 19 through 50 and meet certain requirements in connection with the Supplemental Security Income (SSI) program; (ii) have no medical insurance coverage; and (iii) have countable income equal to or less than 100% of the federal poverty income guidelines. Provides that these persons may be required to choose a medical home and a primary care provider. Provides that medical assistance under these provisions shall be identical to the benefits provided under the State's approved Medicaid plan, except that long-term care services shall not be covered. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to seek to maximize federal financial assistance. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
HFS-MEDICAID-ACCESS-COVERAGE
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Schoenberg [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-03-17 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-002-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1855&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1855.htm |