IL SB1854 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Amends the definition of "imprisonment" to include electronic home detention served by an offender after the offender has been committed to the custody of the sheriff to serve the sentence and the sheriff has placed the offender in an electronic home detention program. Provides that when an offender is sentenced under a provision of law that requires the sentence to include a minimum term of imprisonment and the offender is committed to the custody of the sheriff to serve the sentence, the sheriff may place the offender in an electronic home detention program for service of that minimum term of imprisonment unless the offender was convicted of an excluded offense as defined in the Electronic Home Detention Law or the court's sentencing order specifies that the minimum term of imprisonment shall be served in a county correctional facility.
Title
CD CORR-MINIMUM TERM-DETENTION
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0161 |
2013-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-029-000 |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8A-8 | New Code | See Bill Text |