IL SB1853 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency shall reevaluate the current air pollution operating permit of any facility emitting ethylene oxide and conduct a 90-day public hearing process on such permits. Provides that no air pollution operating permit shall be renewed if the facility is in violation of any federal or State standards or current studies pertaining to ethylene oxide. Provides that a facility emitting ethylene oxide at levels higher than federal or State standards shall immediately cease operations until the level of emissions are reduced below both federal and State standards. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-PERMITS-ETHYLENE OXIDE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |