IL SB1848 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Removes the 2 additional subdivisions of work added to provisions concerning design-bid-build construction. Modifies requirements for single prime projects in which the Capital Development Board or an institution of higher education is the construction agency procuring for building construction contracts in excess of $250,000. Provides that for building construction projects with a total construction cost valued at $20,000,000 or less, institutions of higher education shall not use the single prime delivery method for more than 50% of the total number of projects bid for each fiscal year. Provides that projects with a total construction cost valued greater than $20,000,000 may be bid using the single prime delivery method at the discretion of the institution of higher education. Provides that the Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois may award in each fiscal year single prime contracts with an aggregate total value of no more than $300,000,000. Modifies repeal and inoperative dates. Makes conforming changes. Effective December 15, 2019.
Title
PROCUREMENT-SINGLE PRIME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-001-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-15.93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 30-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 21 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |