IL SB1846 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a restaurant shall, by default, include a specified type of water, milk, milk alternative, or juice with a children's meal sold by the restaurant. Provides that a restaurant may include another beverage with a children's meal upon request. Provides that, during any inspection of a restaurant by a health officer or health inspector of a local health department, the health officer or health inspector shall inspect the restaurant to determine whether it complies with these provisions. Provides that restaurants that violate the provisions are subject to a warning and specified civil penalties. Allows the Department of Public Health to adopt any rules it deems necessary for the implementation, administration, and enforcement.
Title
RESTAURANTS-CHILD BEVERAGES
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0529 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-028-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-18 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Tourism and Hospitality; 008-001-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Tourism and Hospitality |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Tourism and Hospitality |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |