IL SB1841 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning creation of the Board.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |