IL SB1833 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning the filing of policy forms with the Director of Insurance, includes that policies issued to an exempt commercial purchaser, except for workers' compensation policies, are not subject to the provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-POLICY FORMS-EXEMPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-30HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155143Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback