IL SB1828 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that 180 days after the effective date of the bill, each applicant for the issuance or renewal of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall include a full set of his or her fingerprints in electronic format to the Department of State Police for the purpose of identity verification, unless the applicant has previously provided a full set of his or her fingerprints to the Department under this Act or the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the fingerprints must be transmitted through a live scan fingerprint vendor licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation or a criminal justice agency authorized by the Department to submit fingerprints under the Act or the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that these fingerprints shall be checked against the fingerprint records now and hereafter filed in the Department and Federal Bureau of Investigation criminal history records databases, including all available state and local criminal history record information files, including records of juvenile adjudications. Provides that the Department shall charge applicants a fee for conducting the criminal history record check, which shall be deposited in the State Police Services Fund and shall not exceed the actual cost of the State and national criminal history record check. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a license application for a concealed carry license shall contain a full set of fingerprints submitted to the Department in electronic format for the purpose of verification of identity in a form and manner prescribed by the Department, unless the applicant has previously provided a full set of his or her fingerprints to the Department under the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that an applicant for renewal need not resubmit a full set of his or her fingerprints if the applicant has previously provided a full set of his or her fingerprints to the Department under the Act or the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act.
Title
FIREARMS-FINGERPRINTS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1828&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1828.htm |