IL SB1826 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Consumer Choice in Maternal Care for African-American Mothers Pilot Program Act. Requires the Task Force on Infant and Maternal Mortality Among African Americans to partner with community-based maternal care providers to develop rules and regulations for a Medicaid voucher pilot program to expand consumer choice for Black mothers that includes planned home birth services and in-home perinatal and postpartum care services provided by racially concordant nationally accredited certified professional midwives. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to implement the pilot program no later than January 1, 2023. Provides that the pilot program shall operate for a 5-year period. Requires the Task Force to submit annual reports to the General Assembly, beginning January 1, 2024, and each January 1 thereafter through January 1, 2028, that provides a status update on the pilot program and annual impact measure reporting. Provides that the pilot program shall implement a maternity episode payment model that provides a single payment for all services across the prenatal, intrapartum, and postnatal period which covers the 9 months of pregnancy plus 12 weeks of postpartum. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to make available to the Task Force all relevant data related to maternal care expenditures made under the State's Medical Assistance Program so that budget-neutral reimbursement rates can be established for bundled maternal care services spanning the prenatal, labor and delivery, and postpartum phases of a maternity episode.
Title
DHFS-MATERNAL CARE-BLACK WOMEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Appropriations- Health |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Healthcare Access and Availability; 009-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Directed to Multiple Committees Healthcare Accessibility Committee, Appropriations-Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |