IL SB1826 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Respiratory Care Practice Act from January 1, 2016 to January 1, 2026. Amends the Respiratory Care Practice Act. Changes references from the Director of Professional Regulation to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation. Makes changes in provisions regarding definitions, restrictions and limitations, powers and duties of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Respiratory Care Board, examinations, license restoration, grounds for discipline, notice of hearings, transcript of formal hearings, hearing officer proceedings, restoration of suspended or revoked licenses, summary suspension of licenses, administrative review, costs, and the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that parties involved in disciplinary or other proceedings may enter into negotiated consent orders. Provides that all information collected by the Department in the course of examination or investigation of a licensee or applicant remain confidential. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RESPIRATORY CARE SUNSET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 106 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 106 | 195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 106 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 106 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |