IL SB1826 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Third Reading - Lost; 019-030-005
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Third Reading - Lost; 019-030-005
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Authorizes the State Comptroller to create, administer, manage, and operate a supplemental employee deferral plan to supplement and enhance the retirement income of employees of public school districts and community colleges. Sets forth the requirements for a supplemental employee deferral plan.
Title
EMPLOYEE DEFERRAL PLAN
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Schoenberg [D] | Sen. Carole Pankau [R] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 019-030-005 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 010-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |