IL SB1821 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Genetic Counselor Licensing Act, the Illinois Landscape Architecture Act of 1989, the Illinois Athlete Agents Act, the Electrologist Licensing Act, the Detection of Deception Examiners Act, the Professional Geologist Licensing Act, the Land Sales Registration Act of 1999, and the Real Estate Timeshare Act of 1999. Makes conforming changes in the Regulatory Sunset Act and throughout the statutes. Amends the Auction License Act. Repeals provisions requiring Internet auction listing services to be registered with the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and makes conforming changes. Moves definitions of "Internet auction listing service" and "interactive computer service" to provisions concerning definitions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATORY ACTS-REPEAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-22SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0534
2017-09-22SenateEffective Date September 22, 2017
2017-09-22SenateGovernor Approved
2017-07-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-07-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-000-000
2017-07-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - June 30, 2017
2017-06-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-06-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-06-29House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Althoff
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff
2017-05-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210257-101Amended CodeCitation Text
225135ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
225315ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
225401ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
22540710-1Amended CodeCitation Text
22540710-27Repealed CodeCitation Text
2254075-10Amended CodeCitation Text
225412ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
225430ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
2254541-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-20Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-85Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-20Amended CodeCitation Text
225745ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
41051310Amended CodeCitation Text
41051325Amended CodeCitation Text
4105410Amended CodeCitation Text
415522.51Amended CodeCitation Text
415522.51aAmended CodeCitation Text
415557.10Amended CodeCitation Text
415557.2Amended CodeCitation Text
415557.8Amended CodeCitation Text
415558.2Amended CodeCitation Text
415558.6Amended CodeCitation Text
415558.7Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.30Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.32Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.34Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.35Repealed CodeCitation Text
5804.36Amended CodeCitation Text
7012058-50Amended CodeCitation Text
70150526.10-4Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-5Amended CodeCitation Text
765101ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
76586ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1821&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1821.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1821eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1821enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0534.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1821sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1821sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1821sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1821ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1821_05112017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1821_06292017_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1821_07012017_008000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback