IL SB1821 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Postponed State Government and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Postponed State Government and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning expedited long-term care eligibility determinations and enrollment, provides that an applicant for long-term care services under the medical assistance program whose application remains open at least 15 days past the federally established guideline for processing applications shall be entitled to a temporary medical assistance card which shall be issued upon the applicant's request. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to immediately add the person to the facility's roster for payment and notify the managed care organization of the resident's change in payment status, if the resident is enrolled in a managed care organization. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-TEMP MEDICAL CARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Postponed State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2017-01-10 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2017-01-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2017-01-09 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 10, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-01-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 1, 2016 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-11-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-026-001 |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2016-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-11-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-11-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2016-11-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-11-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-11-15 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-019-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-001-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 11-5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |