IL SB1821 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code and the Vital Records Act. Requires each local registrar to transmit an accurate copy of each record of live birth, death, and fetal death to the county clerk of his county on a weekly basis (instead of monthly). Provides that each county clerk shall cancel the registration of any registered voter who has died during the preceding week (instead of month). Provides that each county clerk shall, at least once a month, compare his or her list of registered voters with the master death file or index compiled by the United States Social Security Administration and immediately cancel any deceased voter's registration.
Title
ELEC CD-DECEASED VOTERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1821&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1821.htm |