IL SB1796 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Establishes the Illinois Hope and Opportunity Pathways through Education (IHOPE) Program to develop a comprehensive system in this State to re-enroll significant numbers of high school dropouts in programs that will enable them to earn their high school diploma. Requires the State Board of Education to implement and administer the IHOPE Program. Provides that the IHOPE Program shall award grants to educational service regions and the Chicago school district from appropriated funds to assist in establishing instructional programs and other services designed to re-enroll high school dropouts. Provides that the IHOPE Program shall provide incentive grant funds for regional offices of education and the Chicago school district to develop partnerships with school districts, public community colleges, and community groups to build comprehensive plans to re-enroll high school dropouts in their regions or districts. Sets forth requirements for programs funded through the IHOPE Program. Provides for an IHOPE Plan, sub-grants, how funding is distributed, State aid, categories of programming, the evaluation of programs, and rules. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
SCH CD-DROPOUTS-IHOPE PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-30 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0106 | |
2009-07-30 | Effective Date July 30, 2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-05-18 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-002 | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-04-23 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education | |
2009-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rickey R. Hendon | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James T. Meeks | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |