IL SB1792 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who may claim a qualifying student as a dependent is allowed a credit of up to $2,000 for qualified tuition and fee expenses paid by the taxpayer. Provides that the term qualifying student means a person who (i) is a resident of the State, (ii) is under the age of 24 at the close of the school year for which a credit is sought, and (iii) during the school year for which a credit is sought, is a full-time student enrolled in a program at a qualifying college or university. Effective immediately.
Title
INCOME TAX-TUITION CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | To Credits, Deductions, and Exemptions |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1792&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1792.htm |