IL SB1791 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Changes all references to "Food Stamp Program" to "Supplemental Nutrition Assistance (SNAP) Program". Changes all references to the "Food Stamp Employment and Training Program" to the "SNAP Employment and Training Program". Provides that the SNAP Employment and Training Program shall be voluntary in every county except those in which the Department of Human Services can show that there are sufficient program slots for at least the majority of the county's current non-exempt work registrants. Provides that persons who fail to cooperate with the SNAP Employment and Training Program in counties where available program slots exist for at least the majority of that county's current work registrants shall become ineligible for SNAP benefits according to SNAP regulations. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB AID-SNAP-JOB TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0566 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 043-013-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-002-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-010-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-013-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-003-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |