IL SB1783 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-16 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends both the Quad Cities Regional Economic Development Authority Acts. Provides that the territory of the Authority shall also include JoDaviess, Carroll, Whiteside, and Stephenson Counties. Provides for the appointment of additional members to the Board of the Authority. Provides that the additional members shall be appointed by the county board chairpersons of JoDaviess, Carroll, Whiteside, and Stephenson Counties. Increases the bonding power of the Authority to $250,000,000 (now, $100,000,000).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

QUAD CITIES-DEV AUTH EXPAND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-16 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2009-05-30 Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Louis S. Viverito
2009-05-30 Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2009-05-30 House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Non-Concurs
2009-05-30 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Non-Concurs
2009-05-29 House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Non-Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Jacobs
2009-05-29 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Non-Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Jacobs
2009-05-28 Sponsor Removed Sen. Louis S. Viverito
2009-05-28 Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Louis S. Viverito
2009-05-28 Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 29, 2009
2009-05-28 Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2009-05-28 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
2009-05-28 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-015-000
2009-05-26 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-26 House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
2009-05-26 House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2009-05-22 Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009
2009-05-20 House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-05-20 House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2009-05-20 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-20 Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-20 Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
2009-05-19 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-05-19 House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2009-05-19 Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2009-05-18 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-18 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-13 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-13 Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2009-05-13 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2009-05-13 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
2009-05-12 Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2009-05-08 Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2009
2009-04-22 Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
2009-04-14 Assigned to Executive Committee
2009-04-01 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-01 First Reading
2009-04-01 Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
2009-04-01 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
2009-04-01 Arrived in House
2009-04-01 Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000
2009-03-31 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009
2009-03-31 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Jacobs
2009-03-31 Second Reading
2009-03-31 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-001-000
2009-03-30 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2009-03-25 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-25 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs
2009-03-12 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
2009-03-12 Do Pass Local Government; 008-001-000
2009-03-04 Assigned to Local Government
2009-02-20 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-20 First Reading
2009-02-20 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback